Accounts and annual returns PLAYMATES PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1028557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 10 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 10 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 01 June 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 01 June 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 June 2022 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 30 June 2022 30 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 29 June 2021 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 29 June 2021 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 12 October 2020 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 12 October 2020 134 days late Download Open in new window