FRIENDS OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, HAYES.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity exists to raise funds to repair/maintain/upkeep of the 2* listed church St Mary the Virgin Hayes middlesex
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 08 December 1993: Standard registration
- 08 July 2019: Funds received from 211482-5 LUCY SLAMAKER
- 08 July 2019: Funds received from 211482-2 EMMA ROUSBY THOMPSON'S CHARITY
- 08 July 2019: Funds received from 211482-3 CHARITY OF LOUISA DAVIS
- 08 July 2019: Funds received from 211482-4 ROBERT REID
- 08 July 2019: Funds received from 211482-1 CHARITY OF MISS ANN FLEET
- 08 July 2019: Funds received from 211482 ST MARY'S CHURCH CHARITIES
- 08 July 2019: Funds received from 230155-1 ROGER LEA
- 08 July 2019: Funds received from 230155-2 ROBERT CROMWELL
- 08 July 2019: Funds received from 230155-3 REVEREND WILLIAM BLENCOWE
- 08 July 2019: Funds received from 230155-4 ELIZABETH PARKER
- 08 July 2019: Funds received from 230155-5 HONORABLE JULIANA CURZON CHARITY
- 08 July 2019: Funds received from 230155 HAYES AMALGAMATED CHARITIES
- FRIENDS OF ST MARYS CHURCH ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nicholas Wheeler | Chair | 30 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Margaret Littlefield | Trustee | 28 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janette Lawrence | Trustee | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sandra-Jane Stock | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alan Lambert | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carol Jobson | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.92k | £44.61k | £38.38k | £63.31k | £5.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.23k | £52.22k | £18.20k | £84.73k | £5.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/10/1993 AS AMENDED ON 09/11/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGH THE MAINTENANCE, PRESERVATION, REPAIR, RESTORATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC, FITTINGS AND FURNITURE OF THE CHURCH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, HAYES, MIDDLESEX, HAYES, UB3 2LR (“THE PARISH CHURCH"), WHICH AS OF 1ST NOVEMBER, 2011 WAS CLASSIFIED AS A GRADE II* LISTED BUILDING.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, HAYES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
170 CHURCH ROAD
HAYES
UB3 2LR
- Phone:
- 02088453485
- Email:
- smvhtreasurer@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window