Accounts and annual returns PENNINGTON NURSERY

Charity number: 1028638
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 08 July 2024 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 08 July 2024 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 15 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 15 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 February 2023 223 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 08 February 2023 223 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 20 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 January 2020 On Time Download Open in new window