Financial history PENNINGTON NURSERY

Charity number: 1028638
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £273.95k £276.12k £341.94k £341.94k £423.52k
Total expenditure £243.43k £234.75k £254.04k £254.04k £389.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £124.89k £152.18k N/A £187.73k £177.65k