FORT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of The Fort Foundation is to make grants to individuals and charitable institutions at the Trustees discretion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 November 1993: Standard registration
- THE FORT FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
peter andrew fort | Trustee | 07 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD MARTIN DRURY | Trustee | 28 February 2014 |
|
|||||
JOHN STEPHEN HARTLEY | Trustee | 28 February 2014 |
|
|||||
EDWARD FORT OBE | Trustee | 03 November 1993 |
|
|
||||
IAN WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £625.96k | £300.00k | £338.86k | £37.41k | £41.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £324.28k | £324.28k | £202.72k | £425.23k | £226.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £600.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £25.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £911 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £324.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 13 January 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 13 January 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FORT VALE ENGINEERING LTD
CALDER VALE PARK
SIMONSTONE LANE
SIMONSTONE
BURNLEY
BB12 7ND
- Phone:
- 01282440000
- Email:
- info@fortvale.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window