THE FALCON WOMEN'S CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Women's club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Havering
Governance
- 17 November 1993: Standard registration
- 10 September 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2016 | 28/02/2017 | 28/02/2018 | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.56k | £21.49k | £21.03k | £22.79k | £21.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.56k | £21.49k | £21.03k | £22.43k | £21.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | 27 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2018 | 03 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/10/1993 AS AMENDED ON 22/02/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR WOMEN WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window