UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE IN KENNET (WILTSHIRE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity is democratic, self funded and a self managed organisation which exists to provide education & leisure activities for men & women, no longer in full time employment. Activities are organised entirely by members who both learn from & teach each other. At present nearly 70 groups meet to discuss & learn about a wide variety of subjects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 18 November 1993: Standard registration
- U 3 A IN KENNET (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gavin Maxwell-Hart | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Pocock | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Lockwood Mrs | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Mark Sheen | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bin Ngah Hamzah | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Chambers | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Dewar | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Neville | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE WEAVER | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeffery Hide | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Colin Morison | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Jillian TURNER | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.09k | £8.33k | £22.62k | £10.55k | £21.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.64k | £6.40k | £21.82k | £11.91k | £24.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/09/1993 AS AMENDED ON 24/09/1997 AS AMENDED ON 28/05/2003 AS AMENDED ON 25/11/2009 AS AMENDED ON 24/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 23/11/2011 AS AMENDED ON 28 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 25 Mar 2021 as amended on 20 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE KENNET
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Meadow Rise
Lockeridge
MARLBOROUGH
SN8 4ED
- Phone:
- 07900 223345
- Email:
- info@u3ainkennet.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window