Financial history CONVOY OF MERCY

Charity number: 1028734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £955 £954 £3.04k £824 £6.45k
Total expenditure £8.00k £2.40k £8.31k £5.61k £6.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A