HURLEY VILLAGE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HVA's purpose is to improve the life of its inhabitants. In furtherance of this, events are held including the village fete; the village dance; the village pantomime; a quiz evening and a childrens Christmas party. It publishes an excellent quarterly magazine. The association may make grants for educational and sporting endeavours from a trust established for the benefit of young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 17 November 1993: Standard registration
- HURLEY VILLAGE ASSOCIATION (HVA) (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas John Young | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Julian Mark Stanford | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ROBERT BURFITT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.61k | £10.92k | £9.71k | £34.00k | £10.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.25k | £12.31k | £18.37k | £13.73k | £16.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 January 2021 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH JUNE 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HURLEY, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HURLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hurley Village Hall
High Street
Hurley
MAIDENHEAD
SL6 5LT
- Phone:
- 07901297223
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window