Redlands league of friends

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for items for patients comfort for Redlands Primary care
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 19 November 1993: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 September 2009: Standard registration
- 28 February 2022: Funds received from 1056960 FRIENDS OF NEWCOMBES SURGERY
- CHIDDENBROOK SURGERY LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sheila Ann Job | Chair | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Davis Treasurer | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mary Harris | Trustee | 28 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £477 | £449 | £1.56k | £3.47k | £8.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £422 | £0 | £0 | £11.44k | £6.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 February 2025 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 March 2023 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 June 2021 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MAY 1993 AS AMENDED 28 OCTOBER 1993 as amended on 09 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE HEALTH AMONG PERSONS (BENEFICIARIES) RESIDENT IN THE TOWN OF CREDITON AND OUTLYING PARISHES.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE CREDITON AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Tuckers Meadow
CREDITON
Devon
EX17 3NT
- Phone:
- 01363775210
- Email:
- shedave.uz@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window