Accounts and annual returns PROPER JOB, CORNWALL

Charity number: 1028790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 15 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 15 April 2025 350 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 31 May 2023 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 31 May 2023 396 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 August 2021 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required