Financial history PROPER JOB, CORNWALL

Charity number: 1028790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2.40k £221 £2.45k £5.94k £3.43k
Total expenditure £3.48k £5.04k £2.34k £3.26k £2.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A