ARCHDEACON CAMBRIDGE'S SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds to provide additional facilities and equipment for the school. To engage in activities which support the school and its staff and thereby support pupils at the school. To develop and enhance relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 23 November 1993: Standard registration
- ARCHDEACON CAMBRIDGE'S SCHOOL P T A (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Michael Coleman | Chair | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Cole | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Coleshill | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Lambe | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.74k | £57.73k | £27.26k | £18.73k | £49.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.62k | £43.67k | £23.26k | £9.02k | £58.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 342 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 342 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 June 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 07 November 2020 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 07 November 2020 | 160 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/07/1993 AS AMENDED ON 27/09/1993 AS AMENDED ON 29/09/2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE TWICKENHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
ARCHDEACON CAMBRIDGES SCHOOL
THE GREEN
TWICKENHAM
TW2 5TU
- Phone:
- 02088944777
- Email:
- info@acpta.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window