Financial history HOLY TRINITY PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1028810
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 23/03/2023
Total gross income £140.57k £146.56k £151.93k £149.84k £90.50k
Total expenditure £138.97k £136.37k £158.30k £141.87k £71.30k
Income from government contracts £102.69k £118.42k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.89k £5.14k N/A N/A £619