Accounts and annual returns NEW HINKSEY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1028849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 25 June 2024 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 25 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 17 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 November 2020 183 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required