SALTDEAN PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Saltdean pre-school provides education and child care for local children age 2-5 years
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
Governance
- 23 November 1993: Standard registration
- ST NICHOLAS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Rowe | Chair | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Carter | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Lennox | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Josie Hann | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Gould | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carly Washington | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carla Greest | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.47k | £72.83k | £61.31k | £67.00k | £101.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.48k | £74.27k | £82.09k | £80.66k | £92.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 August 2023 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 31 August 2023 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 August 2022 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 September 2022 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 July 2020 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 July 2020 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/12/1990 AS AMENDED ON 27/04/2011
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEED OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST NICHOLAS CHURCH HALL
SALTDEAN VALE
SALTDEAN
BRIGHTON
BN2 8HA
- Phone:
- 07938 970623
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window