STOCKLAND AND YARCOMBE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a pre-school running 7 sessions per week from Monday to Friday for children aged 2-5 years, term time only. We have a learning through play structure, with painting, play dough, physical play, drawing plus much more. Fully qualified staff run the sessions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 23 November 1993: Standard registration
- STOCKLAND PLAY AND TODDLER GROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christina Leppard | Chair | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Haley Powell- Borge | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
JENNA PARRIS | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Ella Sadler | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pippa Salter | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Durant | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Foxwell | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.19k | £42.03k | £60.31k | £48.79k | £53.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.47k | £40.06k | £47.67k | £53.41k | £60.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £24.20k | £22.27k | £43.64k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.06k | £5.85k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1996, AMENDED 29 SEPTEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
STOCKLAND & YARCOMBE PRE-SCHOOL
THE VICTORY HALL
STOCKLAND
HONITON
EX14 9EF
- Phone:
- 01404 881450
- Website:
-
stocklandpreschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window