Accounts and annual returns AGE CONCERN PEMBROKESHIRE

Charity number: 1028903
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 June 2017 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 June 2017 129 days late
Annual return 31 March 2015 21 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 21 January 2016 On Time