HORAM COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 23 November 1993: Standard registration
- HORAM COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lydia Offen | Chair | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Woods | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Megan Tampin | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Bishop | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Holly-Louise Jones | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ladawn Richardson | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alice Neal | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA DEAN | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frances Misener | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Richardson | Trustee | 09 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.36k | £58.98k | £68.72k | £80.04k | £72.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.80k | £51.59k | £54.66k | £70.09k | £77.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 342 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 342 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 February 2024 | 272 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2022
(These accounts |
27 February 2024 | 272 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23TH NOVEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 11TH SEPTEMBER 2000 as amended on 31 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDSOF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Grange Close
Horam
HEATHFIELD
East Sussex
TN21 0EE
- Phone:
- 01435813264
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window