SPENNYMOOR WEST WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1028945
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2007

Total income: £1,000
Total expenditure: £1,373

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 November 1993: Standard registration
  • 24 March 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • SPENNYMOOR WEST W I (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2004 31/10/2005 31/10/2006 31/10/2007
Total gross income £1.02k £1.05k £1.10k £1.00k
Total expenditure £980 £1.10k £1.04k £1.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2007 18 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2006 17 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2005 08 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2004 19 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2004 Not Required