HELGA MOSEY MEMORIAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust is a small, family trust with limited resources, giving financial support to projects and individuals associated with us who are engaged in the betterment of mankind in body, mind and spirit, and in particular in the relief of those most disadvantaged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
- Stoke-on-trent City
- Afghanistan
- India
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- Syria
Governance
- 23 November 1993: Standard registration
- 24 August 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.10k | £19.22k | £20.43k | £19.02k | £81.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.69k | £17.97k | £20.30k | £20.27k | £69.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 03 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR TOWARDS THE PROPAGATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SUFFERING BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window