Trustees GOOD COMPANIONS OF THE HOLYWELL HOSPITALS
Charity Number: 1028966

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYNN BURNELL JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PAMELA HUNT | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
KARAN HUGHES | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
BARRY LAMBERT | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
LINDA THOMAS | Trustee | 03 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL OLIVER | Trustee | 03 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET KENNDY | Trustee | 05 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL KAY | Trustee | 04 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sue Parkinson | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
MIRIAM METCALFE | Trustee | 12 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
LILIAN EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALUN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN BARBARA CAUSER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EIRLYS HUMPHREYS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.