STANHOE AND BARWICK WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main purposes of the Women's Institute are to enable women who are interested in issues associated with rural life to improve and develop conditions of rural life, to advance their education in citizenship, in public questions, and in all branches of agriculture, handicrafts, home economics, health and social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 25 November 1993: Standard registration
- 23 March 2010: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.27k | £1.69k | £2.37k | £2.56k | £2.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.17k | £1.77k | £2.35k | £2.40k | £2.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 13 May 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 05 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 12 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 10 February 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES ALREADY LODGED
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, INCLUDING ARTS, CRAFTS AND SCIENCES, TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE STANHOE,BARWICK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window