ESSEX SOUTH EAST GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Girlguiding to girls/women within the Essex South East area ranging from age 4 upwards
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
750 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Essex
Governance
- 25 November 1993: Standard registration
- GIRLGUIDING ESSEX SOUTH EAST (Working name)
- ESSEX SOUTH EAST COUNTY GIRL GUIDES (Previous name)
- ESSEX SOUTH EAST GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carole Elaine Davies | Chair | 02 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Perry | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Angela Lacey | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Bray | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Kim Bishop | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
rosalyn jones | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Carol Roberts | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Gardner | Trustee | 18 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Sally Jane Baskett | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIE NYE | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Crowhurst | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.12k | £51.81k | £66.68k | £36.56k | £37.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.58k | £49.79k | £71.47k | £43.77k | £62.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 14TH DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Girlguiding Anglia
7 Gt. Hautbois Road
Coltishall
NORWICH
NR12 7JN
- Phone:
- 07838325586
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window