BRADBOURNE PARK PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bradbourne Park Pre School offers sessional nursery education, set in the grounds of Sevenoaks Primary School. A maximum of 40 children aged between 2.5 and 5 years attend at any one time. The pre-school serves the local area and most of the children go on to attend the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £53,172 from 1 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Kent
Governance
- 25 November 1993: Standard registration
- 25 April 2017: Funds received from 1029323 FIRST STEPS PRE-SCHOOL
- 06 April 2022: Funds received from 1025973 ST MARY'S PLAYGROUP (RIVERHEAD)
- 19 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1164480 THE ANTHONY ROPER PRE-SCHOOL AND KINDERGARTEN
- 19 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1102887 THE CHILDREN'S WORKSHOP
- 19 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1070258 CHEVENING SCHOOL NURSERY
- 19 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1045290 ST JOHN'S PRE-SCHOOL AND TODDLER GROUP
- 19 December 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BRADBOURNE PARK PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.67k | £104.86k | £93.94k | £70.58k | £60.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.69k | £100.10k | £101.57k | £97.06k | £85.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £94.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £53.17k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £90.26k | £87.03k | £60.36k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JULY 1993 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window