THE DAWODU FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1029154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advancement of the Christian faith.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 May 2024

Total income: £500
Total expenditure: £480

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 November 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev ISAAC ODEJIMI Trustee
None on record
JUMOKE DAWODU Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/05/2020 30/05/2021 30/05/2022 30/05/2023 30/05/2024
Total gross income £800 £700 £750 £950 £500
Total expenditure £780 £680 £715 £930 £480
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 May 2024 12 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2023 19 June 2024 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2022 08 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2021 28 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2020 06 April 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
64 COLE CLOSE
LONDON
SE28 8AX
Phone:
02083108652