EALING TALKING NEWSPAPERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Records the local weekly newspaper and other information for distribution on USB memory sticks and other media to blind and visually impaired people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Ealing
Governance
- 29 November 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN GEORGE WATKINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Colin Scott Gourlay | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Williams | Trustee | 09 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARGARET BUTCHER | Trustee | 12 August 2011 |
|
|||||
MRS ALEX BROMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN JOHN MORTIMORE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.84k | £2.23k | £4.47k | £3.62k | £5.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.87k | £5.23k | £5.16k | £5.38k | £5.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/10/1993 AS AMENDED ON 22/07/2010
Charitable objects
TO RELEIVE THE BLIND OR THE PARTIALLY SIGHTED OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED MATERIAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
EALING TALKING NEWSPAPERS
39 BROUGHTON ROAD
LONDON
W13 8QW
- Phone:
- 02088402313
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window