MID DEVON TOWN AND COUNTRY SHOW SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and advance agriculture for the benefit of the public and to seek and generally improve and publicise it in all its branches and to encourage skill and industry in it and in all trades, crafts and connections with it. For the primary purpose of raising money for the pursuance of its Principal Objects to hold an annual agricultural show.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

23 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 02 December 1993: Standard registration
- MID DEVON SHOW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANGUS NEIL COTTEY | Chair |
|
||||||||
Marilyn Ellen Daw | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|||||||
Edgar John Berry | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Malcom William Huxtable | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Clive Robert Hopper | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Karen Margaret Todd | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Norman Thomas | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Adam Short | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Barry Dennis Mildon | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
ROSEMARY HELEN MARGARET CHANIN | Trustee | 07 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Michael John Pring | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Claire Louise Heaven-Roberts | Trustee | 12 January 2018 |
|
|||||||
Rachael Elizabeth Joyce Hamlin | Trustee | 19 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||
ANTHONY MICHAEL OVERHILL | Trustee | 31 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||
Raymond Stephen Sweet | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
RICHARD LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
RICHARD WARD TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PETER FOLLETT PUGSLEY M.A. | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
TERENCE HAMLIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MS SARAH NORMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
COLIN EDWARD ROWLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ROGER HILL | Trustee |
|
||||||||
IAN LUTLEY PUGSLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.82k | £231.68k | £344.90k | £309.39k | £396.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.41k | £243.86k | £284.58k | £330.36k | £324.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 OCTOBER 1993, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5TH. DECEMBER 1994.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE AGRICULTURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO IMPROVE AND PUBLICISE IT IN ALL ITS BRANCHES AND TO ENCOURAGE SKILL AND INDUSTRY IN IT AND ALL TRADES CRAFTS AND PROFESSIONS CONNECTED WITH IT. TO HOLD IN PURSUANCE OF ITS MAIN OBJECTS AN ANNUAL AGRICULTURAL SHOW
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE MID DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Withers Steele
6 Oaklands Court
Tiverton Way
TIVERTON
Devon
EX16 6TG
- Phone:
- 01884253030
- Email:
- cs@middevonshow.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window