SPEEN SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to support educational activities and resources for Speen Church of England First School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 29 November 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tanya Craft | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Louise Harrison | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Johnston | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/09/2019 | 29/09/2020 | 29/09/2021 | 29/09/2022 | 29/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.37k | £2.19k | £5.13k | £5.85k | £13.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.61k | £6.95k | £3.67k | £2.33k | £3.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 September 2022 | 17 August 2023 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 September 2021 | 05 September 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 September 2020 | 21 September 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 September 2019 | 07 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 OCTOBER 1993, AS AMENDED ON 17TH JUNE 1995. as amended on 10 May 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Speen C Of E School
Flowers Bottom Lane
Speen
PRINCES RISBOROUGH
Buckinghamshire
HP27 0SX
- Phone:
- 01494 488321
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window