Financial history EUROPEAN YOUTH PARLIAMENT UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1029243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/01/2020 20/01/2021 20/01/2022 20/01/2023 20/01/2024
Total gross income £51.29k £6.01k £1.32k £50.93k £65.31k
Total expenditure £48.67k £4.51k £519 £51.26k £63.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A