EUROPEAN YOUTH PARLIAMENT UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE EUROPEAN YOUTH PARLIAMENT UNITED KINGDOM (EYPUK) IS A POLITICALLY UNBOUND CHARITY ORGANISATION OPEN TO YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 11-24. EYPUK WORKS ACROSS THE COUNTRY, OPERATING A WIDE RANGE OF EVENTS AND FORUMS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 January 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 November 1993: Standard registration
- EYP(UK) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Meera Kaiser | Chair | 04 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Molly Nancy Boulton | Trustee | 08 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel William Brown | Trustee | 08 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Richards | Trustee | 08 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Rosa Mared Cacciola | Trustee | 08 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Jane Reynolds | Trustee | 08 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Elizabeth Cooper | Trustee | 04 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Bridget Donaldson | Trustee | 04 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Megan Annie Ross Bell | Trustee | 04 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/01/2020 | 20/01/2021 | 20/01/2022 | 20/01/2023 | 20/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.29k | £6.01k | £1.32k | £50.93k | £65.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.67k | £4.51k | £519 | £51.26k | £63.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 January 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 January 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 January 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 January 2023 | 11 December 2023 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 January 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 January 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 January 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 January 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/11/1993 AS AMENDED ON 27/09/1997 AS AMENDED ON 21/09/2007 AS AMENDED ON 14/09/2012
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE AROUND LOCAL, NATIONAL AND EUROPEAN ISSUES BY: A) PROVIDING A FORUM FOR YOUNG PEOPLE TO EXPRESS THEIR OPINION AND TO MAKE THEIR VOICES HEARD ACROSS EUROPE; B) BUILDING NEW SKILLS AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE, PREPARING THEM FOR THEIR FUTURE; AND C)DEVELOPING A STRONG SENSE OF COMMUNITY AND CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Town Hall
High Street
Liverpool
L2 3SW
- Phone:
- 07873729861
- Email:
- info@eypuk.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window