ASHFIELD NURSERY AND PARENTS CENTRE DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
we offer a range of training for people from the community and a range of activities for children such as Holiday playscheme, creche provision to support training, out of school club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 26 November 1993: Standard registration
- 22 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ASHFIELD PARENTS CENTRE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.31k | £85.70k | £65.14k | £90.76k | £70.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.19k | £81.63k | £65.15k | £75.93k | £68.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 FEBRUARY AS AMENDED 7 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS (B) TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE (C) TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
ELSWICK AND WEST CITY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window