UPPER SHIRLEY HIGH PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of community events at the school and entertainments for pupils and parents
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 29 November 1993: Standard registration
- B S A (Working name)
- BELLEMOOR SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- UPPER SHIRLEY HIGH PARENT TEACHER AND FRINDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- USH PTA (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Crookall | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Craig | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £117 | £117 | £117 | £140 | £140 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 August 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 12 July 2021 | 347 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 1 APRIL 2009 CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06/11/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Upper Shirley High School
Bellemoor Road
SOUTHAMPTON
SO15 7QU
- Phone:
- 07813900359
- Email:
- Ushptfa@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window