Financial history EARLEYBIRD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1029326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £179.74k £175.13k £210.22k £194.93k £229.31k
Total expenditure £169.68k £186.29k £189.44k £208.51k £211.39k
Income from government contracts £154.81k £163.64k £192.52k £173.31k £202.90k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A