BROWNBREAD HORSE RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention of equine abuse, their rehabilitation and providing full facilities for their care. Also the training and provision of selected suitable ponies for disabled persons and disability groups, (RDA)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- Essex
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- Kent
- Norfolk
- Portsmouth City
- Suffolk
- Surrey
- Throughout London
- Belgium
- France
- Germany
- Spain
Governance
- 30 November 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TONY SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Reuben Anthony Steains | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donna Shareen Antonia Christman | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David James Christman | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MARY MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTYN PAUL MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/11/2019 | 29/11/2020 | 29/11/2021 | 29/11/2022 | 29/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.47k | £26.43k | £53.38k | £51.75k | £56.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.64k | £33.58k | £27.21k | £34.00k | £88.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 November 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 November 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 November 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 November 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 November 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 November 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 November 2020 | 05 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 November 2020 | 05 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 November 2019 | 29 April 2021 | 212 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 November 2019 | 29 April 2021 | 212 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF HORSES AND PONIES WHO BY REASON OF CRUELTY OR ILL-TREATMENT ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF SUCH HORSES AND PONIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brownbread Horse Rescue
Brownbread Street
Ashburnham
BATTLE
TN33 9NX
- Phone:
- 01424892381
- Email:
- bbhrescue@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window