SWANTON ABBOTT PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1029343
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

EARLY YEARS EDUCATION FOR 2-4 YEAR OLDS

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £32,602
Total expenditure: £51,387

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 November 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SWANTON ABBOTT PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Zoe Taylor Chair 13 January 2023
None on record
Sarah Webb Trustee 17 June 2024
None on record
Danielle Millership Trustee 13 January 2023
None on record
India Grace Larter Trustee 13 January 2023
None on record
Caroline Glibbery Trustee 12 October 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £52.33k £51.42k £63.16k £57.25k £32.60k
Total expenditure £45.19k £47.37k £49.79k £55.40k £51.39k
Income from government contracts £40.60k £45.11k £44.90k £48.24k £26.32k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 16 July 2024 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 16 July 2024 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 09 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 09 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 July 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 01 July 2021 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 October 2020 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 October 2020 122 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Swanton Abbott Pre School
Youngmans Lane
Swanton Abbott
Norwich
NR10 5DZ
Phone:
01692538987