Financial history CHALKE VALLEY PLAYSCHOOL

Charity number: 1029398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £62.15k £82.43k £101.08k £149.44k £166.54k
Total expenditure £54.25k £76.03k £112.09k £137.77k £153.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £33.65k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A