SPRUCE FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting research and scholarship in environmental statistics including publications, conferences, workshops, bursaries etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Northern Ireland
- Portugal
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 30 November 1993: Standard registration
- 18 November 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48 | £48 | £24 | £32 | £4 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £129 | £22.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 15 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 14 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 21 March 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 08 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY BY THE PROMOTION OF STUDY RESEARCH AND RELATED ACTIVITIES IN STATISTICS IN PUBLIC RESOURCES UTILITIES AND IN THE CARE OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window