Trustees TEWKESBURY AND DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1029447

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Franklin | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Rowan | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Berger | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian McHardie-Jones | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Peche | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Barrett | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Val Croudass | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Calvyn Price | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mike Jones | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
George A Webb | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Leyden | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Justin Gowthorpe | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hart | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Fraser | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.