Accounts and annual returns INNER WHEEL CLUB OF COVENTRY PHOENIX BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 1029458
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2008 11 March 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2007 11 March 2009 315 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2005 29 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 Not Required