Accounts and annual returns PENISTONE YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 1029464
Charity reporting is up to date (296 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 December 2024 173 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 22 April 2025 296 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 January 2021 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required