Financial history PENISTONE YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 1029464
Charity reporting is up to date (296 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £18.30k £7.69k £2.35k £22.51k £34.48k
Total expenditure £19.60k £7.42k £4.43k £21.90k £24.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.95k