Trustees THE CROYDON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1029466

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER WILSON | Chair | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Fenella Cardwell | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Hook | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Holmes | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven May | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Chan | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clifford Brett | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Grigsby | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL SMITH | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOY ELLERY | Trustee | 14 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.