KENT AMBULANCE SERVICE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide advice and financial help in times of hardship, illness and to help with the welfare of our members if need be.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 30 November 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryan Hopperton | Chair | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Humm | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Freeman | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
James Apps | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Herbert Baker | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Bingham | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW ROBERT PAUL SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL COTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.73k | £4.04k | £3.22k | £4.26k | £2.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £760 | £5.68k | £1.95k | £2.67k | £129 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2021 | 228 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 JULY 1993 AS AMENDED 13 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG ITS MEMBERS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE COUNTY OF KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
SECAMB
UNIT1 HALL AVENUE
ORBITAL PARK
SEVINGTON
ASHFORD KENT
TN24 0AA
- Phone:
- 01233504658
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window