THE ISLEDON COMMUNITY NURSERY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a community nursery based in north london. The nursery caters for children from 6months to fives years. Children are offered a wide range of play and learning activities from 8am onwards interrupted only by meal times. We have a sfae and fully equipped outdoor area which is used every day. Play and learning activities continue until 6pm when the nursery closes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £102,822 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Islington
Governance
- 01 December 1993: Standard registration
- SAM MORRIS CENTRE NURSERY (Working name)
- SAM MORRIS NURSERY (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RACHID EL-OUARET | Chair | 21 October 2009 |
|
|
||||
Kayte Lawton | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Walker | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £223.08k | £323.05k | £313.19k | £365.63k | £373.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.47k | £341.55k | £373.01k | £342.28k | £381.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £63.99k | £191.13k | £123.17k | £96.69k | £102.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 February 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 February 2022 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2022 | 369 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2022 | 369 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE AND THEREBY PROMOTE THEIR MENTAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE NORTH LONDON GENERALLY
Contact information
- Address:
-
SAM MORRIS NURSERY
PARKSIDE CRESCENT
LONDON
N7 7JG
- Phone:
- 0207 609 1735
- Email:
- INFO@SAMMORRISNURSERY.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window