Financial history PARENTS OF IRBY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1029536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 17/09/2020 17/09/2021 17/09/2022 17/09/2023 17/09/2024
Total gross income £5.43k £4.71k £10.18k £7.92k £8.43k
Total expenditure £11.62k £5.73k £7.36k £4.71k £10.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A