Financial history HINCHLEY WOOD PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1029547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £38.79k £17.89k £26.62k £52.08k £56.26k
Total expenditure £67.31k £33.76k £15.18k £26.08k £26.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A