HINCHLEY WOOD PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1029547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principle activity of our Charity is to raise funds to buy equipment and services that directly benefit the children which would otherwise be beyond the reach of the school's budget. Funds raised also contribute to extending the range of facilities the school can offer the children and to provide support in any other way that it can.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £56,263
Total expenditure: £26,097

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 December 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Victoria Tuttle Trustee 29 September 2023
None on record
Carl Turner Trustee 29 September 2023
None on record
Paul Morgan Trustee 29 September 2023
None on record
Amy Cyprian Sinead Grace Trustee 29 September 2023
None on record
Kerry Elizabeth Leggeat Trustee 29 September 2023
None on record
Aleksandra Zablocka Trustee 22 September 2022
None on record
Katy Fernandes Trustee 22 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £38.79k £17.89k £26.62k £52.08k £56.26k
Total expenditure £67.31k £33.76k £15.18k £26.08k £26.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 03 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 03 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 04 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 04 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 21 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 21 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 26 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 August 2021 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 07 August 2021 68 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HINCHLEY WOOD PRIMARY SCHOOL
CLAYGATE LANE
ESHER
KT10 0AQ
Phone:
02083981310