Financial history SOUTH WEST AREA SITTING SERVICE LIMITED

Charity number: 1029583
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £30.16k £30.73k £32.64k £31.34k £31.97k
Total expenditure £32.92k £33.53k £33.00k £28.95k £30.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A