THE HEATHERS NURSERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-School and early years education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £153,131 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 02 December 1993: Standard registration
- HEATHERS NURSERY (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN MARTIN KIDDELL | Chair | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Davidson | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Magdalena Csicso | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Smith | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Jade Meachen | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucille Belinda Barry | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Barry-Winson | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.10k | £154.30k | £156.96k | £151.98k | £176.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.09k | £142.52k | £156.14k | £151.66k | £174.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £116.03k | £137.11k | £147.01k | £132.24k | £153.13k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.21k | £500 | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 10 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/10/1993 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10/12/1997 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18/09/2012 as amended on 20 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heather's Nursery
Bracken Avenue
NORWICH
NR6 6LS
- Phone:
- 01603485371
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window